TN SB0133 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, specifies that the department's quarterly report on highway road projects be submitted to the speaker of the senate, the speaker of the house, and the chairs of the transportation committees instead of submitted to the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 54.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, specifies that the department's quarterly report on highway road projects be submitted to the speaker of the senate, the speaker of the house, and the chairs of the transportation committees instead of submitted to the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 54.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2016-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2016
2015-02-09SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2015-01-17SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-16SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0208 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback