TN SB0133 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes job performance evaluations of employees of state level entities that are exempt from the Tennessee Excellence, Accountability and Management Act of 2012 confidential and not a public record to the same extent as job performance evaluations of state service employees are confidential. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes job performance evaluations of employees of state level entities that are exempt from the Tennessee Excellence, Accountability and Management Act of 2012 confidential and not a public record to the same extent as job performance evaluations of state service employees are confidential. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-06SenateAssigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
2013-02-19SenateAction Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/12/2013
2013-02-13SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013
2013-01-30SenateP2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2013-01-28SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-25SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0059 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback