TN SB0131 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 223
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires, except for antique motor vehicles, that on all motor vehicles that are factory-equipped to illuminate the registration plate, the registration plate must be illuminated at all times that the headlights are illuminated. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires, except for antique motor vehicles, that on all motor vehicles that are factory-equipped to illuminate the registration plate, the registration plate must be illuminated at all times that the headlights are illuminated. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-29HousePub. Ch. 223
2013-04-29HouseEffective date(s) 07/01/2013
2013-04-19HouseSigned by Governor.
2013-04-08HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-04-04HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2013-04-02HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2013-04-02HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-04-01HouseS. concurred in H. am. 3
2013-03-28HousePlaced on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/1/2013
2013-03-25HousePassed H., Ayes 63, Nays 34
2013-03-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2013
2013-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2013
2013-03-19HouseRec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2013-03-14HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/19/2013
2013-03-14HouseRe-ref. to House Transportation Committee
2013-03-14HouseH. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA0098)
2013-03-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2013
2013-03-11HouseReset on Next Available cal.
2013-03-11HouseAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0079)
2013-03-11HouseAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0078)
2013-03-11HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2013-02-25SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2013-02-21SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-02-21SenatePassed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
2013-02-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/21/2013
2013-02-14SenateS. Reset on Cal. for 2/21/2013
2013-02-14SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0011)
2013-02-14SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0005)
2013-02-12SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/14/2013
2013-02-11SenateS. Reset on Cal. for 2/14/2013
2013-02-07SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/11/2013
2013-02-06SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2013-01-30SenatePlaced on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 2/6/2013
2013-01-30SenateP2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
2013-01-28SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-24SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0266 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 223

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback