TN SB0131 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1078
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Medical School Authorities Act of 2010." - Amends TCA Title 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Medical School Authorities Act of 2010." - Amends TCA Title 7.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-05-12 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-28 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1078
2010-06-04 Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 7 - SA1473)
2010-06-04 Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 6 - SA1467)
2010-06-04 Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 5 - SA1440)
2010-06-04 Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - SA1427)
2010-06-04 Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA1397)
2010-06-04 Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA1058)
2010-06-04 Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0212)
2010-06-04 Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
2010-06-04 Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/04/2010
2010-06-03 S. Reset on Cal. for 6/4/2010
2010-06-02 Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/03/2010
2010-06-01 Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/02/2010
2010-05-27 S. Reset on cal. for 6/2/2010
2010-05-25 Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/27/2010
2010-05-24 S. Reset on Cal. for 5/27/2010
2010-05-20 Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/24/2010
2010-05-12 Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 2 PNV 0
2010-05-12 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/12/2010
2010-05-11 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/12/2010
2010-05-06 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/11/2010
2010-05-04 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/11/2010
2010-04-29 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/04/2010
2010-04-27 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/4/2010
2010-04-22 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/27/2010
2010-04-20 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/27/2010
2010-04-14 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/20/2010
2010-03-24 Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 00
2010-03-17 Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/24/2010
2010-03-17 Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/24/2010
2010-03-11 Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/17/2010
2009-04-28 Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 5/5/2009
2009-04-23 Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009
2009-04-13 Ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm.
2009-04-13 Recalled from S. Trans. Comm.
2009-03-16 Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
2009-02-11 P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
2009-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-02 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0193 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-28 - Pub. Ch. 1078

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback