TN SB0130 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a two-year pilot program for a litter control corridor on two state highways in Davidson County; requires 5 percent of litter control grant funding that Davidson County receives from bottled beverage taxes to be set aside to pay for the pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 7, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 5; Section 41-2-123; Title 54; Title 57, Chapter 5, Part 2 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 7, Part 3; Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 5; Section 41-2-123; Title 54; Title 57, Chapter 5, Part 2 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 4, relative to litter.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-15SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-13SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0156 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-01 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback