TN SB0129 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits the sheriff or chief administrator of a jail to contract with a substance abuse treatment program to provide services to inmates housed in the jail. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, permits the sheriff or chief administrator of a jail to contract with a substance abuse treatment program to provide services to inmates housed in the jail. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0159 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee