TN SB0129 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 445
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 445
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions governing the manufacturing of alcoholic beverages, including provisions governing where distilleries may be located in this state. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3, Part 2 and Title 57, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions governing the manufacturing of alcoholic beverages, including provisions governing where distilleries may be located in this state. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3, Part 2 and Title 57, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Rep. Joe Carr [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 8 (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 58 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 51 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO DEFER TIME SPECIFIC AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 59 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 26 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 9 BY Faison PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 55 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 8 BY Carr J PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 7 BY Floyd PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 50 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Floyd PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 52 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Floyd PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 36 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Floyd PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 36 N: 41 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 3 BY Overbey (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 3 BY Overbey (Y: 12 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 8 BY Niceley (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 58 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 51 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO DEFER TIME SPECIFIC AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 59 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 26 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 9 BY Faison PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 55 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 8 BY Carr J PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 7 BY Floyd PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 50 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Floyd PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 52 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Floyd PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 36 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Floyd PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 36 N: 41 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 3 BY Overbey (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 3 BY Overbey (Y: 12 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 8 BY Niceley (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Pub. Ch. 445 |
2013-05-22 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2013 |
2013-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-23 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-18 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 8 |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. 8 |
2013-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar # 2 for 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | S. failed to concur in H. am. 8 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 58, Nays 30 |
2013-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 13 - HA0473) |
2013-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 12 - HA0472) |
2013-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 6 - HA0408) |
2013-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 11 - HA0469) |
2013-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 10 - HA0468) |
2013-04-15 | House | Am. 9 tabled. |
2013-04-15 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 8 of 0 - HA0415) |
2013-04-15 | House | Am. 7 tabled. |
2013-04-15 | House | Am. 5 failed. |
2013-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - HA0405) |
2013-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA0404) |
2013-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0271) |
2013-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0104) |
2013-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 22, Nays 9 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - SA0148) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0103) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0102) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 8 of 0 - SA0346) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 7 of 0 - SA0296) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 6 - SA0230) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 5 - SA0150) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - SA0149) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/25/2013 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/25/2013 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/18/2013 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/18/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/14/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0102 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 445