TN SB0127 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates certain segments of Chickamauga Creek as Class I natural river areas. - Amends TCA Title 11, Chapter 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 11, Chapter 13, relative to scenic rivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 371 | |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/22/2023 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0150 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023