TN SB0127 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts from state and local taxation, all contributions or distributions made to, or on behalf of, participating students pursuant to any individualized education account (IEA). - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49, Chapter 10, Part 14 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 49, Chapter 10, Part 14 and Title 67, relative to taxation of individualized education accounts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-15SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-13SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1271 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback