TN SB0126 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Rural Broadband Grant Expansion Program." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Rural Broadband Grant Expansion Program." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0930 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee