TN SB0126 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 344
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 344
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, defines "curbstoning" as the practice of selling, or offering to sell, a motor vehicle that is not titled in the seller's name by a person engaged primarily in the sale of used motor vehicles who is not licensed to sell motor vehicles in this state and permits state entities to seize vehicles offered for sale as part of a curbstoning scheme. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2; Title 55, Chapter 16; Title 55, Chapter 17, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, defines "curbstoning" as the practice of selling, or offering to sell, a motor vehicle that is not titled in the seller's name by a person engaged primarily in the sale of used motor vehicles who is not licensed to sell motor vehicles in this state and permits state entities to seize vehicles offered for sale as part of a curbstoning scheme. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2; Title 55, Chapter 16; Title 55, Chapter 17, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 344 | |
2015-05-06 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2015-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0423) |
2015-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0110) |
2015-04-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-02 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0174) |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0132 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 344