TN SB0126 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-30 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-30 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a sample ballot be posted prior to election on county election commission website or, if county election commission does not have website, on the secretary of state website. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 12; Title 2, Chapter 5, Part 2 and Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires a sample ballot be posted prior to election on county election commission website or, if county election commission does not have website, on the secretary of state website. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 12; Title 2, Chapter 5, Part 2 and Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0891 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0126&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0126.pdf |