TN SB0124 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Pub. Ch. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Pub. Ch. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes exemption for compliance with platting regulations for the division and plats of land partitioned by deeds; requires that plats subdividing land within a regional planning commission and approved by the commission contain the most recent recorded deed book number and page number for each deed of the property being platted in order to be filed, even if the plat was partitioned by a court. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 3, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, deletes exemption for compliance with platting regulations for the division and plats of land partitioned by deeds; requires that plats subdividing land within a regional planning commission and approved by the commission contain the most recent recorded deed book number and page number for each deed of the property being platted in order to be filed, even if the plat was partitioned by a court. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 3, Part 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Pub. Ch. 77 | |
2009-05-12 | Effective date(s) 04/27/09 | |
2009-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-04-15 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-04-14 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-04-13 | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 1 | |
2009-04-13 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0165) | |
2009-04-13 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-04-02 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-03-30 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-03-30 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 29, Nays 2 | |
2009-03-30 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0105) | |
2009-03-27 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/30/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 2 | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-02 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0304 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 77