TN SB0122 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "School Turnaround Pilot Program Act." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to kindergarten through grade twelve (K-12) education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02 Effective date(s) 05/27/2021
2021-06-02 Pub. Ch. 578
2021-05-27SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-17SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-11SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-04HousePassed H., Ayes 81, Nays 12, PNV 0
2021-05-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0450)
2021-05-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0339)
2021-05-04HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-05-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-05-04SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 21, Nays 9
2021-05-04SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0236)
2021-05-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0461)
2021-05-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0453)
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021
2021-05-04SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 4 PNV 0
2021-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/4/2021
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-22SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
2021-04-07SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
2021-03-31SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
2021-01-15SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-13SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1501 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 578

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback