TN SB0122 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 405
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, removes provision exempting employees of local governments, public housing authorities and non-profit 501(c)(3) entities from the agency's conflict of interest requirements. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 23.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, removes provision exempting employees of local governments, public housing authorities and non-profit 501(c)(3) entities from the agency's conflict of interest requirements. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 23.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-22SenatePub. Ch. 405
2013-05-22SenateEffective date(s) 05/14/2013
2013-05-14SenateSigned by Governor.
2013-05-03SenateTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-05-01SenateSigned by H. Speaker
2013-05-01SenateSigned by S. Speaker
2013-04-22SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-04-16SenatePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0
2013-04-16SenateSubst. for comp. HB.
2013-04-15SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-04-15SenatePassed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
2013-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2013
2013-04-10SenateRec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2013-04-10SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013
2013-04-10SenateR/S #83(8) to be heard in S. S&L Gov. Comm. 4/10/2013
2013-04-02SenateAssigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2013-03-27SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013
2013-01-30SenateP2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2013-01-28SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-24SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0001 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 405

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback