TN SB0122 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes man who has paid child support for a child who is not his biological child to recover such child support from the biological father. - Amends TCA Section 36-2-309.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes man who has paid child support for a child who is not his biological child to recover such child support from the biological father. - Amends TCA Section 36-2-309.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-02 Withdrawn.
2012-02-02 Recalled from S. Jud. Comm.
2011-02-09 P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2011-02-07 Intro., P1C.
2011-01-24 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0419 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-15 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback