TN SB0119 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 158
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 158
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Teaching Evaluation Enhancement Act." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Teaching Evaluation Enhancement Act." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 158 | |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/25/2015 |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Education Committee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0108 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 158