TN SB0116 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the underground utility damage enforcement board to June 30, 2023; directs the division of state audit within the office of the comptroller of the treasury to conduct a timely study on the allocation of employees from the Tennessee public utilities commission to the underground utility damage enforcement board. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 65, Chapter 31.
Title
As enacted, extends the underground utility damage enforcement board to June 30, 2023; directs the division of state audit within the office of the comptroller of the treasury to conduct a timely study on the allocation of employees from the Tennessee public utilities commission to the underground utility damage enforcement board. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 65, Chapter 31.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 333 | |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0154) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0137) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0448 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 333