TN SB0114 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the department to increase the hourly wage for direct care professionals employed at contracted agencies of the department for the home- and community-based waiver programs for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities, or any successor programs, such that on July 1, 2021, the hourly wage is at least $12.50 per hour. - Amends TCA Title 33.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33, relative to the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02 Effective date(s) 05/27/2021
2021-06-02 Pub. Ch. 576
2021-05-27SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-17SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-11SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-05SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-05-04HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-05-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0448)
2021-05-04HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-05-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-05-04SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-05-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0450)
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021
2021-05-04SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/4/2021
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-26SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-22SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
2021-03-31SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-25SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
2021-03-18SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-02-26SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-02-11SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-02-10SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-01-21SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-01-20SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-01-14SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2021-01-13SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2021-01-13SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-12SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0130 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 576

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback