TN SB0107 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an annual cost of living increase for families first temporary assistance payments based on the consumer price index. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 71, relative to the Families First Act of 1996.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0886 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee