TN SB0105 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 341
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, specifies that no party may settle a claim for permanent disability benefits unless the settlement agreement is approved by a workers' compensation judge and that any settlement not so approved is void; revises other various provisions of the Workers‘ Compensation Law. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 14; Title 8, Chapter 21, Part 4; Title 50, Chapter 6; Title 50, Chapter 9 and Title 50, Chapter 3, Part 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, specifies that no party may settle a claim for permanent disability benefits unless the settlement agreement is approved by a workers' compensation judge and that any settlement not so approved is void; revises other various provisions of the Workers‘ Compensation Law. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 14; Title 8, Chapter 21, Part 4; Title 50, Chapter 6; Title 50, Chapter 9 and Title 50, Chapter 3, Part 7.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-08 Pub. Ch. 341
2015-05-08 Effective date(s) 05/04/2015
2015-05-04SenateSigned by Governor.
2015-04-23SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2015-04-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-04-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-04-21SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2015-04-20HousePassed H., Ayes 91, Nays 2, PNV 1
2015-04-20HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0249)
2015-04-20HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2015-04-06HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2015-04-02SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2015-04-02SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 3, PNV 1
2015-04-02SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0236)
2015-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/2/2015
2015-03-30SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
2015-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2015
2015-03-24SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2015
2015-03-18SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/24/2015
2015-03-17SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/24/2015
2015-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2015
2015-01-27SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-01-17SenateRefer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2015-01-17SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
2015-01-16SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0094 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 341

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback