TN SB0103 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Pub. Ch. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, specifies that local boards of education and governing bodies of public charter schools, as applicable, have the sole authority to open or close schools during a public health emergency; authorizes the board or governing body to delegate that authority to the director of schools or school administrator, as applicable. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 58 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49; Title 58 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12 Pub. Ch. 96
2021-04-12 Effective date(s) 04/07/2021
2021-04-07SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-03-30SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-03-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-03-29SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-03-26SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-03-25HousePassed H., Ayes 85, Nays 2, PNV 1
2021-03-25HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0046)
2021-03-25HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-02-24HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-02-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 5
2021-02-22SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0014)
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/22/2021
2021-02-10SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-02-03SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/10/2021
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0225 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 96

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback