TN SB0102 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 05/17/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 05/17/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a local education agency, public charter school, public institution of higher education, the state board of education, and the department of education from requiring an educator, employee of an LEA or charter school, faculty member, or employee of a public institution of higher education to complete or participate in implicit bias training; defines "implicit bias training"; prohibits adverse licensure and employment actions from being taken against such an individual for the individual's failure or refusal to participate in implicit bias training. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to implicit bias training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Effective date(s) 05/17/2023 | |
2023-05-24 | Pub. Ch. 438 | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-05-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 71, Nays 22, PNV 0 |
2023-04-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 5 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/21/2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/22/2023 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0158 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 438