TN SB0102 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 323
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the Tennessee council for career and technical education four years to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 49, Chapter 11.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the Tennessee council for career and technical education four years to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 49, Chapter 11.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19 Pub. Ch. 323
2017-05-19 Effective date(s) 05/09/2017
2017-05-09SenateSigned by Governor.
2017-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2017-05-03HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-05-02SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-05-02SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2017-05-01HousePassed H., Ayes 73, Nays 0, PNV 5
2017-05-01HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2017-04-06HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2017-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-04-03SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/3/2017
2017-03-29SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
2017-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2017-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-12SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0239 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 323

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback