TN SB0102 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 95
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes individuals or entities to correspond with the department of labor and workforce development through electronic means; requires employers to file a portion of the wage and premium report electronically in a format prescribed by the commissioner; revises other various unemployment compensation provisions. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7, Part 1; Section 50-7-304; Section 50-7-404; Section 50-7-501; Section 50-7-503 and Section 50-7-715.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes individuals or entities to correspond with the department of labor and workforce development through electronic means; requires employers to file a portion of the wage and premium report electronically in a format prescribed by the commissioner; revises other various unemployment compensation provisions. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7, Part 1; Section 50-7-304; Section 50-7-404; Section 50-7-501; Section 50-7-503 and Section 50-7-715.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recomended for passage with amendment, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-20 Pub. Ch. 95
2015-04-20 Effective date(s) 07/01/2015
2015-04-10SenateSigned by Governor.
2015-04-02SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2015-04-01HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-03-31SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-03-31SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2015-03-30HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0
2015-03-30HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0045)
2015-03-30HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2015-03-12HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2015-03-09SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2015-03-09SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2015-03-09SenateSenate adopted Amendment 1
2015-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/9/2015
2015-03-05SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/9/2015
2015-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/5/2015
2015-02-24SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2015-02-18SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/24/2015
2015-02-11SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/17/2015
2015-01-27SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-01-17SenateRefer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2015-01-17SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
2015-01-16SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0091 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 95

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback