TN SB0102 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - Pub. Ch. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, removes prohibition against selling produce raised in community gardens. - Amends TCA Title 43, Chapter 24, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, removes prohibition against selling produce raised in community gardens. - Amends TCA Title 43, Chapter 24, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - S. E,A&NR COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-11SenatePub. Ch. 3
2013-03-11SenateEffective date(s) 03/07/2013
2013-03-07SenateSigned by Governor.
2013-02-27SenateTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-02-27SenateSigned by H. Speaker
2013-02-26SenateSigned by S. Speaker
2013-02-26SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-02-25SenatePassed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0
2013-02-25SenateSubst. for comp. HB.
2013-02-25SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-02-25SenatePassed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0
2013-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/25/2013
2013-02-20SenateRec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2013-02-13SenatePlaced on S. E,A&NR Comm. cal. for 2/20/2013
2013-01-30SenateP2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm.
2013-01-28SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-23SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0117 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 3

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback