TN SB0101 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes retired agents or officers of the department of revenue to retain the officer or agent's service weapon and badge under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Section 67-1-1441.
Title
As introduced, authorizes retired agents or officers of the department of revenue to retain the officer or agent's service weapon and badge under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Section 67-1-1441.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0101&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0101.pdf |