TN SB0098 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, decreases from five days to 10 days the time within which the commissioner is required to report the death of any person in custody to members of the general assembly representing the legislative districts where the deceased person resided at the time of death; adds a requirement that the report include the name of the facility where the death occurred. - Amends TCA Title 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, relative to oversight of certain governmental entities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0571 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback