TN SB0097 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. T&S Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. T&S Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits traffic surveillance cameras that monitor speed to be implemented after July 1, 2011; allows existing traffic surveillance cameras that monitor speed to be used until their contract expires. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, prohibits traffic surveillance cameras that monitor speed to be implemented after July 1, 2011; allows existing traffic surveillance cameras that monitor speed to be used until their contract expires. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. T&S Com. | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0342 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-12 - Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2012
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0097&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0097.pdf |