TN SB0093 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/29/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/29/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the Tennessee technology development corporation to June 30, 2025. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 14, Part 3 and Title 4, Chapter 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 14, Part 3 and Title 4, Chapter 29, relative to the Tennessee technology development corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Effective date(s) 03/29/2021 | |
2021-04-06 | Pub. Ch. 52 | |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-03-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-03-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-02-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/22/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/10/2021 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0313 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 52