TN SB0088 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, decreases from five to three years the amount of time from the completion of a person's sentence that must have elapsed before the person may apply for expunction of records. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, decreases from five to three years the amount of time from the completion of a person's sentence that must have elapsed before the person may apply for expunction of records. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0134 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback