TN SB0086 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes, rather than requires, tax credits and other economic incentives based on employment to include individuals having a co-employment relationship with a professional employer organization and a client. - Amends TCA Section 62-43-105.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes, rather than requires, tax credits and other economic incentives based on employment to include individuals having a co-employment relationship with a professional employer organization and a client. - Amends TCA Section 62-43-105.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - SENATE FW&M REVENUE SUBCOMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-20 Pub. Ch. 84
2015-04-20 Effective date(s) 07/01/2015
2015-04-09SenateSigned by Governor.
2015-03-31SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2015-03-31HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-03-31SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-03-26SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2015-03-26HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0
2015-03-26HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2015-03-09HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2015-03-05SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2015-03-05SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 22, Nays 0
2015-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/5/2015
2015-03-03SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2015-02-25SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/3/2015
2015-02-24SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, w/recommend
2015-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Tax Subcommittee calendar for 2/24/2015
2015-02-19SenateRefer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee
2015-02-11SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/17/2015
2015-01-22SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-01-17SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-01-17SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
2015-01-16SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0076 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 84

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback