TN SB0086 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a parent desiring to relocate more than 100 miles from the other parent or outside the state to send notice of the move to the other parent no later than 90 days, rather than 60 days, before the move. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires a parent desiring to relocate more than 100 miles from the other parent or outside the state to send notice of the move to the other parent no later than 90 days, rather than 60 days, before the move. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Campfield (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-10 Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2011-03-07 Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
2011-03-07 Passed S. as am., Ayes 18, Nays 9
2011-03-07 S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0031)
2011-03-03 Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/7/2011
2011-02-28 S. Reset on Cal. for 3/7/2011
2011-02-24 Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/28/2011
2011-02-22 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2011-02-16 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/22/2011
2011-02-15 Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/22/2011
2011-02-10 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/15/2011
2011-02-07 P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2011-01-15 Intro., P1C.
2011-01-14 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0024 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-28 - Failed for Lack of Second in: C&FA Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback