TN SB0086 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/17/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/17/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that a person requesting public records is not entitled to special or more expeditious access to records under this part due to the person's occupation or association with a specific profession. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7, relative to public records.
Sponsors
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Effective date(s) 04/17/2023 | |
2023-04-25 | Pub. Ch. 157 | |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-03-30 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2023-03-30 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-02-16 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/13/2023 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/7/2023 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0734 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 157