TN SB0085 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "County Financial Management Systems Act of 2013"; except in Davidson, Shelby, Knox and Hamilton, allows counties to adopt a centralized system for managing fiscal procedures; if adopted by a county, supersedes prior laws governing the county's fiscal procedures. - Amends TCA Title 5 and Title 7.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "County Financial Management Systems Act of 2013"; except in Davidson, Shelby, Knox and Hamilton, allows counties to adopt a centralized system for managing fiscal procedures; if adopted by a county, supersedes prior laws governing the county's fiscal procedures. - Amends TCA Title 5 and Title 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0063 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0085&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0085.pdf |