TN SB0085 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-07 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-07 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the penalty for knowingly making a false report of child abuse or child sexual abuse from a Class E felony to a Class D felony if at the time the report is made the defendant is a party in a custody or visitation determination, the custody or visitation determination involves the person against whom the report is made, and the report is made for the purpose of delay or to gain advantage in the custody or visitation determination. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6; Title 37, Chapter 1 and Title 39, Chapter 15.
Title
As introduced, increases the penalty for knowingly making a false report of child abuse or child sexual abuse from a Class E felony to a Class D felony if at the time the report is made the defendant is a party in a custody or visitation determination, the custody or visitation determination involves the person against whom the report is made, and the report is made for the purpose of delay or to gain advantage in the custody or visitation determination. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6; Title 37, Chapter 1 and Title 39, Chapter 15.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-07 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-01-15 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0095 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-21 - Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/28/2012
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0085&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0085.pdf |