TN SB0084 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-03 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes that a commercial driver license issued with a hazardous materials endorsement expires on the date the hazardous materials endorsement authorization expires. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 3, relative to commercial driver licenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-03SenateWithdrawn.
2023-02-03SenateRecalled from Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
2023-02-01SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/8/2023
2023-01-20SenateRefer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
2023-01-13SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-01-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments
2023-01-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback