TN SB0084 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes person with a handgun permit who is not consuming alcohol to carry handgun in building where beer or alcoholic beverages are being served subject to posting of property provisions, and adds violation of possessing a firearm where alcohol is served as a reason for revocation of a person's handgun permit. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, authorizes person with a handgun permit who is not consuming alcohol to carry handgun in building where beer or alcoholic beverages are being served subject to posting of property provisions, and adds violation of possessing a firearm where alcohol is served as a reason for revocation of a person's handgun permit. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Withdrawn. | |
2010-03-24 | Recalled from S. Jud. Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-29 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0503 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-01 - Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to summer study
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0084&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0084.pdf |