TN SB0082 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-20 - Refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-20 - Refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from August 1 to July 31, the date by which the name, address, and telephone number of persons designated to check buses transporting children with disabilities for such children must be supplied to the LEA each year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 49 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 9; Title 49 and Title 55, relative to school buses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-20 | Senate | Refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0146 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-20 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.