TN SB0076 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the transfer of wills and marriage licenses from the clerk's office to other suitable facilities. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 18, Chapter 1; Section 18-6-109 and Section 32-2-102.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the transfer of wills and marriage licenses from the clerk's office to other suitable facilities. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 18, Chapter 1; Section 18-6-109 and Section 32-2-102.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Pub. Ch. 79 | |
2019-04-09 | Effective date(s) 04/03/2019 | |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-02-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/11/2019 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/5/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0392 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 79