TN SB0075 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 199
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 199
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department to disclose certain information about children adopted from the department's guardianship to the adoptive family; requires the department to promulgate rules to govern the operation of a foster parent advocacy program. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Section 37-2-415.
Title
As enacted, requires the department to disclose certain information about children adopted from the department's guardianship to the adoptive family; requires the department to promulgate rules to govern the operation of a foster parent advocacy program. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Section 37-2-415.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Pub. Ch. 199 | |
2015-04-30 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-06 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-06 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/9/2015 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/9/2015 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/5/2015 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/24/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/17/2015 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0065 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 199