TN SB0074 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the department to create a safety reporting system where the department's employees may report information regarding the safety of those served by the department and the safety of the department's employees. - Amends TCA Section 37-5-106.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the department to create a safety reporting system where the department's employees may report information regarding the safety of those served by the department and the safety of the department's employees. - Amends TCA Section 37-5-106.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Pub. Ch. 21 | |
2015-04-01 | Effective date(s) 03/27/2015 | |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-03-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2015-03-19 | House | Am. withdrawn. |
2015-03-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment 1 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/9/2015 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/24/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/17/2015 |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0064 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 21