TN SB0070 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that it is not an offense for a person to transport and properly store a firearm in a motor vehicle parked on school property. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that it is not an offense for a person to transport and properly store a firearm in a motor vehicle parked on school property. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0481 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-18 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee