TN SB0070 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes several permissive penalty provisions mandatory and increases the allowable range for fines for offenses against animals. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 44 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, makes several permissive penalty provisions mandatory and increases the allowable range for fines for offenses against animals. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 44 and Title 70.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Com. | |
2011-02-07 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-01-15 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0042 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-08 - Failed for Lack of Motion in: Agriculture Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0070&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0070.pdf |