TN SB0070 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates Class A misdemeanor offense of owner or employee of intellectual property seizing property alleged to be counterfeit or imitation but permits seizures by law enforcement officers as currently provided by law. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14 and Title 47.
Title
As introduced, creates Class A misdemeanor offense of owner or employee of intellectual property seizing property alleged to be counterfeit or imitation but permits seizures by law enforcement officers as currently provided by law. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14 and Title 47.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/27/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/20/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/19/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Action def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 4/29/09 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/15/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/8/2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0054 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-28 - Held on desk.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0070&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0070.pdf |