TN SB0064 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Pub. Ch. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Pub. Ch. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides for the naming of certain roads and bridges in honor of certain specified persons, and provides for the placement of other certain signage. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Title
As enacted, provides for the naming of certain roads and bridges in honor of certain specified persons, and provides for the placement of other certain signage. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] | Rep. Vince Dean [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Conference Committee Report (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-31 | House | Pub. Ch. 482 |
2013-05-31 | House | Effective date(s) 05/20/2013 |
2013-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-05-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-05-08 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-19 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0 |
2013-04-19 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 26, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2013-04-19 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Dean, Goins, Camper) |
2013-04-19 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Tracy, Harper, Niceley) |
2013-04-19 | House | S. refused to recede from its non-concurrence. |
2013-04-19 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 3 cal. for 4/19/2013 |
2013-04-19 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. 1 & 2 |
2013-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/19/2013 |
2013-04-19 | House | S. refused to concur in am. 2 |
2013-04-19 | House | S. refused to concur in am. 1 |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/19/2013 |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0 |
2013-04-18 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0575) |
2013-04-18 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0357) |
2013-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0407) |
2013-04-15 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0225) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1030 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 482