TN SB0064 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 377
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 377
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enhances penalties for patronizing prostitution and promoting prostitution in certain instances; provides immunity for minors arrested for prostitution. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As enacted, enhances penalties for patronizing prostitution and promoting prostitution in certain instances; provides immunity for minors arrested for prostitution. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Beavers (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Beavers (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 377 | |
2011-06-03 | Effective date(s) 06/01/11 | |
2011-06-01 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-27 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-25 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-21 | Passed H., Ayes 83, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-21 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0568) | |
2011-05-21 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0255) | |
2011-05-21 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-05-21 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-05-21 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-21 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0511) | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/21/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Comm | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-15 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/15/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/22/2011 | |
2011-02-15 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/22/2011 | |
2011-02-10 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/15/2011 | |
2011-02-07 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-01-15 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0035 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 377