TN SB0064 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts from the requirements of the School Support Organization Financial Accountability Act school support organizations intending to raise or anticipating raising $30,000 or less during a school year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, exempts from the requirements of the School Support Organization Financial Accountability Act school support organizations intending to raise or anticipating raising $30,000 or less during a school year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0114 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-01 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0064&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0064.pdf |