TN SB0059 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes the statutory apportionment formula used to calculate franchise and excise taxes from a three-factor formula to a single-sales-factor formula. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, changes the statutory apportionment formula used to calculate franchise and excise taxes from a three-factor formula to a single-sales-factor formula. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-15SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2015-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015
2015-03-31SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/recommend, as amended
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/31/2015
2015-03-24SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/31/2015
2015-03-18SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/24/2015
2015-03-17SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/24/2015
2015-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/17/2015
2015-02-10SenateRefer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee
2015-01-17SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-01-16SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
2015-01-15SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0423 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback