TN SB0059 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Pub. Ch. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes and encourages teacher training programs at public institutions of higher education to offer coursework on neurological or brain science research. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes and encourages teacher training programs at public institutions of higher education to offer coursework on neurological or brain science research. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 56.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-03HousePub. Ch. 46
2013-04-03HouseEffective date(s) 03/26/2013
2013-03-26HouseSigned by Governor.
2013-03-15HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-03-14HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2013-03-13HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2013-03-12HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-03-11HousePassed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0
2013-03-11HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2013-02-13SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2013-02-11SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-02-11SenatePassed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0
2013-02-07SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/11/2013
2013-02-06SenateRec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2013-01-30SenatePlaced on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 2/6/2013
2013-01-30SenateP2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
2013-01-28SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-15SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0246 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 46

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback